Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés de La Moneda Cañas y Silva, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Almería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹BornBurgos
20 Jul 168360.5SelectedBishop of Almería, Spain
20 Dec 168360.9ConfirmedBishop of Almería, Spain
1684²61.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
13 Mar 168764.1DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de La Moneda Cañas y Silva:
Bishop Andrés de La Moneda Cañas y Silva O.S.B. (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Almería

  • a bishop for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 225, Number 1,398
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015