Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostinho a Jesu (Pedro) de Castro, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1537Born
13 Jun 158850.6AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Jan 158951.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
25 Nov 160972.1DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Agostinho a Jesu (Pedro) de Castro
Archbishop Agostinho a Jesu (Pedro) de Castro O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Graça, Convent, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceBraga, Archdiocese of Braga

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 139
  • bp/bd/ob/c2: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018