Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Diss, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1878Born
7 Jul 190123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
8 Jul 192143.4AppointedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
1 Oct 193860.6ResignedPrefect of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire
15 Sep 196385.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Korhogo, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Joseph Diss
Father Joseph Diss S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Korhogo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrasbourg, France

  • a priest for 62.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018