Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ettore Diotallevi

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1608AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
17 Sep 1635AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
27 Oct 1635InstalledBishop of Fano, Italy
30 Apr 1641DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ettore Diotallevi
Bishop Ettore Diotallevi (died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 71, and Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,608, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast