Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Di Luigi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1491AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
25 Oct 1500AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
27 Aug 1512AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
1519ResignedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Di Luigi
Bishop Giovanni Di Luigi O. Carm. , Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 97, and Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,512, Number 21*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 181, and Page 117
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,491, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast