Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf von Diepholz

Deceased

Bishop of Utrecht

Apostolic Administrator of Osnabrück


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1401BornHunte
26 Sep 142625.7SelectedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
10 Dec 143231.9ConfirmedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
Jan 1433²32.0Ordained BishopBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
30 Aug 145453.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Osnabrück, Germany
25 Mar 145554.2DiedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rudolf von Diepholz:
Bishop Rudolf von Diepholz (died ) Bishop of Utrecht

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 253
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,717

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013