Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerhard Wildgraf von Dhaun

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1231¹Born
23 Dec 125120.9AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
24 Mar 125221.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
25 Sep 125928.7DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Wildgraf von Dhaun
Archbishop Gerhard Wildgraf von Dhaun (born 1231, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBraunschweig

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 322
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,763
  • ob/c2: ATh
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,837

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast