Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal del Giudice

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1660Born
11 Jun 172564.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jul 172565.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
30 Jan 174382.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

MicroData Summary for Niccolò del Giudice
Niccolò Cardinal del Giudice (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaples, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jun 1725

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018