Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni (John) de’ Gigli

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1434¹Born
30 Aug 149763.6AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 149763.6Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
25 Aug 149864.6DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (John) de’ Gigli
Bishop Giovanni (John) de’ Gigli (born 1434, died ) Bishop of Worcester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruges
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for .9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,477
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 62
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 268
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 95
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,497, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast