Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Inácio da Fonseca Manso

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1761³Born
24 Feb 178524.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 181857.7SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
23 Aug 181958.5ConfirmedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
27 Dec 181958.8Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
11 Jun 183473.3DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Inácio da Fonseca Manso
Bishop João Inácio da Fonseca Manso (born , died ) Bishop of Leiria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontemor-o-Novo

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 234
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017