Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Deza, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1443BornToro
147027.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Apr 149451.3AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
23 Jun 149451.5AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
14 Feb 149855.1AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
7 Feb 150057.1AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
30 Oct 150461.8AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
9 Jul 152380.5DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Deza:
Archbishop Diego de Deza O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 271, and Page 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 159, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013