Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aloysius Dettmer, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of De Aar, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1915Born
20 May 194428.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
24 Mar 195337.5AppointedPrefect of De Aar, South Africa
13 Apr 196751.6ResignedPrefect of De Aar, South Africa
6 Aug 198468.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of De Aar, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Dettmer
Father Aloysius Dettmer S.C.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of De Aar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHartington, NE, USA
Death PlaceMiddelburg, Saudi Arabia

  • a priest for 40.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 19 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast