Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Rinaldo d’Este

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned the Cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1655Born
2 Sep 168631.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 168833.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
21 Mar 169539.7ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
22 Oct 173782.3Died

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo d’Este
(Layman) Rinaldo d’Este (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena

  • a cardinal for 8.5 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018