Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Espinay

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Mar 1486AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
4 Nov 1493AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
25 Sep 1500AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
1503²DiedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Espinay
Bishop Jean d’Espinay (died 1503) Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 175, and Page 199
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 193
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1486, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast