Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal De Simone

Deceased

Deacon of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1768Born
15 Mar 183061.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 183061.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
18 Dec 183062.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of the Roman Curia - Other
9 Nov 183768.9DiedDeacon of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Domenico De Simone
Domenico Cardinal De Simone (born , died ) Deacon of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018