Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Rojas y Asúa, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622²BornBuenache de Alarcón, Spain
1644²22.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 168260.9SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
8 Mar 168361.1ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
10 Apr 168361.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
Jan 168462.0InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
25 Nov 168563.8DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Rojas y Asúa:
Bishop Juan de Rojas y Asúa O. de M. (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 287
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,637
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 225, Number 1,392
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015