Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal de’ Medici (Jr.)

Deceased

Administrator of Pisa, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1544Born
31 Jan 156015.3Elevated to Cardinal
26 Apr 156015.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
19 Jun 156015.7AppointedAdministrator of Pisa, Italy
20 Nov 156218.1DiedAdministrator of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de’ Medici (Jr.) (VIAF: 30332021)
Giovanni Cardinal de’ Medici (Jr.) (born , died ) Administrator of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Death PlaceLivorno
Buried Place (Original)S. Lorenzo, Church, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a cardinal for 2.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 Jan 1560
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018