Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Delgado, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1687AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
22 Dec 1688InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
25 Nov 1698DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Delgado
Bishop Nicolás Delgado O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 287
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 229, Number 1,427
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast