Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean delle Fiandre

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1279AppointedBishop of Metz, France
9 Jun 1282AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
14 Oct 1292DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean delle Fiandre
Bishop Jean delle Fiandre (died ) Bishop of Liège

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 302, and Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Jul 2020

Quantcast