Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Zaccaria Cardinal Delfino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina)

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1527BornVenezia
1550²22.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 155326.1AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
7 Feb 155426.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
Aug 1555³28.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
22 Mar 156133.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
12 Mar 156537.9Elevated to Cardinal
7 Sep 156538.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro
Oct 1565³38.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
22 Mar 157446.9ResignedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
15 Apr 157851.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
17 Aug 157952.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
19 Dec 158356.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Zaccaria Delfino (VIAF: 19240866)
Zaccaria Cardinal Delfino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 273
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016