Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Achille Cardinal d’Estampes de Valanšay

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1593BornTours, France
13 Jul 164350.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
14 Dec 164350.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 May 164450.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
27 Jun 164652.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

MicroData Summary for Achille d’Estampes de Valanšay:
Achille Cardinal d’Estampes de Valanšay (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015