Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Della Casa

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1503Born
Apr 1544³40.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
2 Apr 154440.6AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
23 Jul 154743.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
1550²46.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
14 Nov 155653.2DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Della Casa (VIAF: 71528487)
Archbishop Giovanni Della Casa (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSan Mattia, Church, Murano
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,809
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018