Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Youssef Debs (Diab)

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1849Born
17 Nov 187526.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 189646.6AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
22 Mar 189646.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
Dec 1912³63.3DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youssef Debs (Diab)
Archbishop Youssef Debs (Diab) (born , died Dec 1912) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo, Archeparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite)

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017