Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Maria d’Aste, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1654Born
22 May 169035.7AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
12 Jul 171964.8DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria d’Aste
Archbishop Francesco Maria d’Aste C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast