Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Alba

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
1667²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 168542.3SelectedBishop of Solsona, Spain
10 Sep 168542.6ConfirmedBishop of Solsona, Spain
24 Aug 169350.6AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Apr 169754.3DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Alba
Bishop Manuel de Alba (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcalá de Henares

  • a priest for 30.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114, and Page 153
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 227, Number 1,412
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018