Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomas Luiz da Conceição, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1703³BornLisboa, Portugal
4 Aug 172622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
3 Jul 174238.8SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
26 Nov 174239.2ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1743¹39.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1744¹40.3DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomas Luiz da Conceição:
Bishop Tomas Luiz da Conceição O.A.D. (born , died 1744) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a priest for 17.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015