Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestro Daziari

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1480AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
3 Apr 1480Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
29 Jun 1486DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Daziari
Bishop Silvestro Daziari (died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 131
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,930
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,480, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast