Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião de Ascensão, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561Born
18 Apr 161150.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
26 Jun 161150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
18 Mar 161453.2DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Sebastião de Ascensão:
Bishop Sebastião de Ascensão O.P. (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013