Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal d’Aragona

Deceased

Administrator of Taranto

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Administrator of Cosenza

Administrator of Esztergom

Administrator of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1456BornNapoli
10 Nov 147721.3AppointedAdministrator of Taranto, Italy
10 Dec 147721.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 147721.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
20 Jan 147922.5AppointedAdministrator of Badajoz, Spain
14 May 147922.8ResignedAdministrator of Badajoz, Spain
14 Jan 148023.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
14 Nov 148125.3AppointedAdministrator of Cosenza, Italy
13 Jan 148326.5AppointedAdministrator of Salerno, Italy
10 Sep 148327.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
20 Dec 148327.4AppointedAdministrator of Esztergom, Hungary
17 Oct 148529.3DiedAdministrator of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni d’Aragona:
Giovanni Cardinal d’Aragona (born , died ) Administrator of Taranto

  • a cardinal for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1477

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015