Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edmond Alfred Dardel, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Seychelles

Titular Bishop of Zaraï

Titular See: (died before consecration)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1825Born
1849¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 188963.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Seychelles
23 Aug 188963.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraï
21 Mar 189064.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Seychelles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmond Alfred Dardel
Father Edmond Alfred Dardel O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Seychelles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix-les-Bains, France

  • a priest for 41.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 602
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017