Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacques Cardinal d’Annebaut

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
18 Aug 153939.6AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
19 Dec 154444.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Nov 154747.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
22 Mar 154848.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
7 Jun 155757.4DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques d’Annebaut (VIAF: 3630562)
Jacques Cardinal d’Annebaut (born 1500, died ) Bishop of Lisieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNormandy
Death PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Lisieux, Diocese of Lisieux

  • a cardinal for 12.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 24*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018