Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal d’Angennes

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eufemia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1530Born
27 Jul 155625.7AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
17 May 157039.5Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157039.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta
20 Nov 157040.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eufemia
23 Mar 158756.3DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Charles d’Angennes (VIAF: 88984178)
Charles Cardinal d’Angennes (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRambouillet
Death PlaceCorneto
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco, Church, Corneto

  • a cardinal for 16.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast