Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bruno Roberto D’Amore, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1915Born
28 Oct 193318.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jun 193924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
31 Aug 196853.4ConfirmedApostolic Administrator of Montevergine, Italy
21 Oct 197560.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Montevergine, Italy
3 Mar 198570.0DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bruno Roberto D’Amore
Father Bruno Roberto D’Amore O.S.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Montevergine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellino

  • a priest for 45.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017