Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Daton (Dalton)

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornKilkenny
23 Jan 169451.1SelectedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
20 Feb 169653.1ConfirmedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
26 Jan 171269.1DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Daton (Dalton):
Bishop William Daton (Dalton) (died ) Bishop of Ossory

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013