Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio degli Agli

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Dec 1465AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
4 May 1467AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fiesole, Italy
30 Apr 1470AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Volterra, Italy
1477²DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio degli Agli
Archbishop Antonio degli Agli (died 1477) Bishop of Volterra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 154, and Page 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 220
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1465, Number 39*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast