Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-César-Louis Loup Constance Joseph Mathieu d’Agoult de Bonneval

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1749BornGrenoble
28 Jan 178738.0SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
23 Apr 178738.2ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
13 May 178738.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Mar 180253.1ResignedBishop of Pamiers, France
21 Jul 182475.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-César-Louis Loup Constance Joseph Mathieu d’Agoult de Bonneval
Bishop Charles-César-Louis Loup Constance Joseph Mathieu d’Agoult de Bonneval (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers

  • a bishop for 37.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016