Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Daddeo (Doddeo)

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
13 Aug 158450.6AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
15 Apr 159258.2AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
24 Sep 160066.7DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Daddeo (Doddeo)
Bishop Camillo Daddeo (Doddeo) (born 1534, died ) Bishop of Fossano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018