Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546Born
17 May 157024.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157024.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
21 Jul 157428.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro

MicroData Summary for Giulio Acquaviva d’Aragona
Giulio Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (born 1546, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaples, Italy

  • a cardinal for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018