Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard d’Abbadie

Deceased

Bishop of Aire, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1486AppointedBishop of Aire, France
10 Aug 1511DiedBishop of Aire, France

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Bernard d’Abbadie
Bishop Bernard d’Abbadie (died ) Bishop of Aire

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 80
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1486, Number 15*
  • b: CB, 8 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast