Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José da Assunção Vieira, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Lamego, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1781Born
31 May 180625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
5 Dec 183251.7SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
29 Jul 183352.3ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
18 Nov 184160.6DiedBishop-Elect of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José da Assunção Vieira
Father José da Assunção Vieira O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Lamego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRequeizo

  • a priest for 35.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,833

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast