Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zygmunt Czyżowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Oct 1655AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
25 Oct 1655AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
1 Sep 1664AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
15 Dec 1666AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
1667DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Czyżowski:
Bishop Zygmunt Czyżowski Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 130, and Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013