Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Petrus Joseph Alfons Cuypers, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Vichada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1903Born
15 Aug 192219.3EnteredMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
2 Jun 192825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
22 Jan 196359.8AppointedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia
196965.7ResignedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia
28 Jul 198279.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Vichada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Petrus Joseph Alfons Cuypers
Father Petrus Joseph Alfons Cuypers S.M.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Vichada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchinnen, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands
Death PlaceSchinnen, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands

  • a priest for 54.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: MW, 19 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017