Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Castiglione

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420²BornMilan
2 Sep 144424.6AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
3 Oct 145333.7AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
17 Dec 145636.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Mar 145737.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
14 Apr 146040.2DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Castiglione:
Giovanni Cardinal Castiglione (born 1420, died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a cardinal for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1456

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015