Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berenguer Cruilles

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1348AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
22 Mar 1349Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
26 Jul 1362DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Berenguer Cruilles
Bishop Berenguer Cruilles (died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gerona, Diocese of Gerona

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 303, Number 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 261
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,977

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast