Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Croce, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1642Born
30 May 166522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Sep 169856.2AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
21 Sep 169856.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
20 Apr 171370.8DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Croce
Bishop Ambrogio Croce O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018