Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Belisario Cardinal Cristaldi

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1764Born
2 Oct 182662.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 182864.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 182864.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
25 Feb 183166.6DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Belisario Cristaldi
Belisario Cardinal Cristaldi (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 4.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast