Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tiberio Cardinal Crispi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Administrator of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1498Born
6 Jul 154345.4AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
19 Dec 154446.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 154546.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
7 Jun 154648.3ResignedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
1 Apr 154749.1AppointedAdministrator of Amalfi, Italy
20 Nov 155153.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
17 Mar 156163.1ResignedAdministrator of Amalfi, Italy
18 May 156264.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
21 Jun 156466.3AppointedAdministrator of Amalfi, Italy
1565²66.9AppointedAdministrator of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
19 Jan 156566.9AppointedAdministrator of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
7 Sep 156567.6ResignedAdministrator of Amalfi, Italy
7 Nov 156567.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
27 Jun 156668.4ResignedAdministrator of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
6 Oct 156668.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Crispi (VIAF: 54090679)
Tiberio Cardinal Crispi (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSutri, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sutri, Diocese of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Capranica

  • a cardinal for 21.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 305, and Page 106
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 306
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1543, Number 14*
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018