Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Crispi

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1716¹BornNaxos
19 Jul 175842.5AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
12 Jul 177357.5AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
13 Nov 179680.8DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Crispi:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Crispi (born 1716, died ) Archbishop of Naxos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 302, and Page 366
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015