Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Cristofori

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1813BornViterbo, Italy
27 Jul 188572.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jul 188572.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
6 Dec 188572.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
14 Mar 188976.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
30 Jan 189178.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cristofori:
Cardinal Carlo Cristofori (born , died ) Prefect of Indulgences and Relics

  • a cardinal for 5.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013