Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Creagh

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1523¹Born
22 Mar 156441.2AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
9 Apr 156441.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
14 Oct 158562.7DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Creagh (VIAF: 23050027)
Archbishop Richard Creagh (born 1523, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLondon, Diocese of London, England, Great Britain

  • a bishop for 21.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,570
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,672
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018